12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-02-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Re-Referred to GVO, LCA/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 561) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:05PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to GVO, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |