|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 305) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 907) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 342) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to EET, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|