|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to WAL, HET, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 311) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 774) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 1:00PM; 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|