12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 266) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to AEN, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |