|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HWN/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on HWN/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on HWN/HTH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-21 1:03PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on HWN/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:03PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to HWN/HTH, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|