House | 03/10/2022 | Referred to LAT, CPC, referral sheet 24 | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 11) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kidani). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-02-22. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2003) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. | ||
12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | Re-Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to LCA, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |