House
|
04/19/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Branco voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2083-22), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Har.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 42
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 564) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-31-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3527) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to HTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|