Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 955).
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 955).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-25-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 910).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 762).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, McKelvey, Ohno, Tokioka excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2131-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, Nishimoto, Wildberger, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2084-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Har.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 47
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 681) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3713) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to HMS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|