House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 916).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 785).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2162-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-21-22 2:00PM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2115-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 46
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 650) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-06-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported from EET/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3711) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to EET/TRS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|