Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 956).
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 956).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-26-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 916).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 787).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2161-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-21-22 2:00PM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2029-22), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Woodson, Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 04-13-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to HET, CPC, referral sheet 46
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 653) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-06-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3699) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|