House | 04/08/2022 | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 47 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 688) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | One Day Notice 04-07-22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3768) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to HTH/CPN. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |