House | 04/14/2022 | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 46 | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 654) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | One Day Notice 04-06-22. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3692) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |