House
|
04/19/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2087-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Har.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 45
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 630) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported from HMS/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3633) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to HMS/EET.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|