House
|
04/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2040-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 04-13-22 11:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 42
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 579).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-01-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3568) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|