Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 955).
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 955).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-25-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 910).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 764).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, McKelvey, Ohno, Tokioka excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2136-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, Nishimoto, Wildberger, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2113-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, LoPresti, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-14-22 10:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 47
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 699) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from HOU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3729) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Misalucha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-22 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to HOU/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|