House
|
04/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2060-22), recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Kapela, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 04-13-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 47
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 700) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3821) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to LCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|