House | 04/06/2022 | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 45 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 635) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | One Day Notice 04-05-22. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3641) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Wakai. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to HRE. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |