Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 757).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, McKelvey, Ohno, Tokioka excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2137-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, Nishimoto, Wildberger, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2046-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, LoPresti, Nakamura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-13-22 11:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-13-22 10:45AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 44
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-04-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3607) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, DeCoite, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to TRS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|