House
|
04/19/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2091-22), recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Har.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 42
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 582).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Riviere). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-01-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3579) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:03PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to HTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|