House
|
04/08/2022
|
Referred to HHH, EDN, referral sheet 47
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 706) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3804) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3518), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:03PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to HTH, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|