House | 04/08/2022 | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 47 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 707) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | One Day Notice 04-07-22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported from CPN/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3733) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | The committee(s) on CPN/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to CPN/HOU. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |