Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 750).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, McKelvey, Ohno, Tokioka excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2126-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, Nishimoto, Wildberger, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2033-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 04-14-22 10:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 46
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 647) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-06-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3706) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to GVO.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|