House
|
04/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2034-22), recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Thursday, 04-14-22 10:15AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 44
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 593) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-04-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3586) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|