Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 717).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2070-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to EEP, referral sheet 46
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 649) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-06-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported from CPN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3703) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to CPN/EET.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|