House
|
04/19/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2081-22), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Har.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 47
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 671) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3779) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3515), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to CPN,WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|