House | 04/08/2022 | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 47 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 674). | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | One Day Notice 04-07-22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported from GVO/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3802) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | The committee(s) on GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred to GVO/PSM. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Offered. |