Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 911).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of reconsideration and Senate agreement (Sen. Com. No. 911).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-25-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-25-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-20-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 881).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 725).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2120-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Referred to EEP, referral sheet 47
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 677).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3791) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 1:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to AEN/PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|