House
|
04/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2053-22), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 47
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 678) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from EET/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3769) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to EET/PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|