Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | One Day Notice 04-07-22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported from HMS/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3828) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | The committee(s) on HMS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to HMS/JDC. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |