Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | One Day Notice 04-04-22. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3592) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to PSM. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |