Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | One Day Notice 04-01-22. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3571) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to AEN. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |