Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | One Day Notice 04-07-22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3822) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Keohokalole. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to LCA. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |