Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Riviere). | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | One Day Notice 04-01-22. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3580) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:03PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to HTH. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |