Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | One Day Notice 04-04-22. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3602) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to HTH/PSM. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |