Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | One Day Notice 04-07-22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported from EET/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3717) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | The committee(s) on EET/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to EET/HOU. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |