Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | One Day Notice 04-01-22. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3576) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred to HTH. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Offered. |