Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | One Day Notice 04-06-22. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Reported from CPN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3710) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | The committee(s) on CPN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred to CPN/EET. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Offered. |