Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | One Day Notice 04-07-22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported from HMS/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3721) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Acasio. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Dela Cruz. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | The committee(s) on HMS/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Referred to HMS/EDU. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Offered. |