LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR55
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SR55
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SR55
Action History
Senate
03/30/2022
The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Senate
03/29/2022
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-30-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
Senate
03/23/2022
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
Senate
03/11/2022
Referred to JDC.
Senate
03/10/2022
Offered.