Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3782) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3525), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|