Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | One Day Notice 04-07-22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3792) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 1:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to AEN/PSM. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |