Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | One Day Notice 03-31-22. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3528) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to HTH. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |