Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | One Day Notice 04-06-22. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Reported from EET/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3712) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Shimabukuro. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | The committee(s) on EET/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to EET/TRS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Offered. |