House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from ECD/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 667) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Quinlan, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD/HLT on Friday, 02-10-23 9:05AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to ECD/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|