Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Act 162, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Act 162, on 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 890).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 875).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 03-31-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 837).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Takayama, Garcia.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 512).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 524) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Richards). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-30-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 399).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1081) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-23-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 700) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-23.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-23.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Saturday, 02-04-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|