Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 176, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 176, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 40).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 40) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Nakashima, Lamosao, Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-27-23 10:00AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; McKelvey, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Kong, Lamosao, Sayama, Pierick.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 707) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1770) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee on CPN will reconsider its previous decision on 03-15-23 and will hold a public decision making on 04-05-23 10:16AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 235).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1049) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Lowen, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tam; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Lamosao, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 02-07-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to TOU, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|