House | 02/07/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 88) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Pending introduction. |