Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from HRE/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1381) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HRE/EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 116).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from HET/EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET/EDN on Wednesday, 02-08-23 2:10PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HET/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|