Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-16-23 3:00PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to GVO, TCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 209).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Souza voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1034), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran, Poepoe; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 660) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souza; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 8:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to LGO, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|