House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 264) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-23.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Saturday, 02-04-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HLT, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|